NY A04245 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-21 - print number 4245a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-21 - print number 4245a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides employers with a tax credit for expenditures to provide dependent care to adult dependents of employees of eligible expenditures for adults 60 or over or otherwise eligible; applies to corporate and noncorporate employers; also provides such a credit for employees or other taxpayers, to the extent not covered by the employer.
Title
Provides employers with a tax credit for expenditures to provide dependent care to adult dependents of employees of eligible expenditures for adults 60 or over or otherwise eligible; applies to corporate and noncorporate employers; also provides such a credit for employees or other taxpayers, to the extent not covered by the employer.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-21 | Assembly | print number 4245a |
2012-05-21 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to ways and means |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2011-02-02 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S00613 (Same As) 2012-05-17 - PRINT NUMBER 613B