NY A04206 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-19 - advanced to third reading cal.655
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-19 - advanced to third reading cal.655
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to educational or training work activity requirements.
Title
Relates to educational or training work activity requirements.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-19 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.655 |
2016-05-17 | Assembly | reported |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to social services |
2015-01-29 | Assembly | referred to social services |