NY A04093 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-02 - print number 4093b
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-02 - print number 4093b
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates new assault crime for an assault on a retired police officer who previously arrested the assailant; establishes that assaulting such a retired police officer with intent to seek retribution is assault in the first degree.
Title
Creates new assault crime for an assault on a retired police officer who previously arrested the assailant; establishes that assaulting such a retired police officer with intent to seek retribution is assault in the first degree.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-02 | Assembly | print number 4093b |
2016-05-02 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2016-02-22 | Assembly | print number 4093a |
2016-02-22 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2015-01-29 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S01827 (Same As) 2016-06-01 - referred to codes