NY A04056 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-11 - print number 4056a
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-11 - print number 4056a
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates climate liability for fossil fuel related activity which caused or contributed to climate change; creates a right of action.
Title
Creates climate liability for fossil fuel related activity which caused or contributed to climate change; creates a right of action.
Sponsors
Asm. Michaelle Solages [D] | Asm. Emily Gallagher [D] | Asm. Harvey Epstein [D] | Asm. Steven Raga [D] |
Asm. Sarahana Shrestha [D] | Asm. Manny De Los Santos [D] | Asm. William Colton [D] | Asm. Karines Reyes [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-11 | Assembly | print number 4056a |
2024-01-11 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to environmental conservation |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2023-02-09 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S00212 (Same As) 2024-01-04 - PRINT NUMBER 212A