NY A04055 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-20 - VETOED MEMO.144
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-20 - VETOED MEMO.144
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "bird-friendly building council act" to establish a council to promote the use of bird-friendly building materials and design features in buildings; research the magnitude of problems facing birds colliding with buildings; identify existing and emerging products, technologies and concepts to reduce or eliminate bird mortality from building collisions; and develop public awareness.
Title
Enacts the "bird-friendly building council act" to establish a council to promote the use of bird-friendly building materials and design features in buildings; research the magnitude of problems facing birds colliding with buildings; identify existing and emerging products, technologies and concepts to reduce or eliminate bird mortality from building collisions; and develop public awareness.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-20 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.144 |
2019-11-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.256 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | substituted for a4055b |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-11 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2019-06-05 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 25B |
2019-06-05 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-05 | Senate | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2019-04-30 | Senate | referred to governmental operations |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-04-08 | Assembly | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 25A |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-03-20 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-03-19 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.307 |
2019-01-09 | Assembly | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | substituted by s25b |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.256 |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | rules report cal.256 |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | print number 4055b |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental operations |
2019-04-05 | Assembly | print number 4055a |
2019-04-05 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental operations |
2019-01-31 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S00025 (Same As) 2019-11-20 - VETOED MEMO.144