NY A03894 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-14 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-14 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the availability of certain benefits and entitlements to exonerees.
Title
Relates to the availability of certain benefits and entitlements to exonerees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-14 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | print number 3894b |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2018-02-28 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2018-02-13 | Assembly | print number 3894a |
2018-02-13 | Assembly | amend and recommit to judiciary |
2018-01-17 | Assembly | committed to judiciary |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2017-05-02 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2017-01-30 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S00053 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - PRINT NUMBER 53B