NY S00053 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - PRINT NUMBER 53B
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - PRINT NUMBER 53B
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the availability of certain benefits and entitlements to exonerees.
Title
Relates to the availability of certain benefits and entitlements to exonerees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 53B |
2018-06-20 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY |
2018-06-12 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 53A |
2018-06-12 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2017-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A03894 (Same As) 2018-06-14 - reported referred to ways and means