NY A03856 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-16 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-16 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits the adoption of rules and regulations by state and local government entities prior to the effective date of an act of the legislature which necessitates such rules, regulations or actions.
Title
Permits the adoption of rules and regulations by state and local government entities prior to the effective date of an act of the legislature which necessitates such rules, regulations or actions.
Sponsors
Asm. Richard Gottfried [D] | Asm. Thomas Abinanti [D] | Asm. Sandra Galef [D] | Asm. James Brennan [D] |
Asm. Amy Paulin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2016-05-16 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-05-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-05-12 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.585 |
2016-05-10 | Assembly | reported |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2015-01-27 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S01910 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS