NY A03660 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-27 - REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS
Pending: Senate Commerce, Economic Development and Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-27 - REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS
Pending: Senate Commerce, Economic Development and Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to electronic permit applications and electronic recordkeeping.
Title
Relates to electronic permit applications and electronic recordkeeping.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
2018-02-27 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-02-27 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-02-15 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.673 |
2018-02-13 | Assembly | reported |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | print number 3660a |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to codes |
2017-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2017-01-30 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S01646 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES