NY A03463 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-15 - signed chap.382
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-15 - signed chap.382
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Adds North Chuctanunda Creek to the definition of inland waterways.
Title
Adds North Chuctanunda Creek to the definition of inland waterways.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-15 | Assembly | signed chap.382 |
2023-09-07 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2023-06-10 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-06-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-06-09 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.823 |
2023-06-09 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6349A |
2023-06-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2023-06-09 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2023-06-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.752 |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | rules report cal.752 |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | reported |
2023-05-30 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-05-23 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2023-05-19 | Assembly | print number 3463a |
2023-05-19 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to environmental conservation |
2023-02-03 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S06349 (Same As) 2023-06-09 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3463A