NY A03277 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-10)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-06 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-06 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits certain sex offenders from residing within 1,350 feet of school grounds, except that in cities having a population of one million or more, no such sex offender may reside within 500 feet of school grounds; a violation thereof shall be a class C felony.
Title
Prohibits certain sex offenders from residing within 1,350 feet of school grounds, except that in cities having a population of one million or more, no such sex offender may reside within 500 feet of school grounds; a violation thereof shall be a class C felony.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-06 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2011-10-21 | Assembly | print number 3277a |
2011-10-21 | Assembly | amend and recommit to correction |
2011-01-24 | Assembly | referred to correction |
Same As/Similar To
S03204 (Same As) 2012-06-21 - COMMITTED TO RULES