NY A03037 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on October 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-23 - signed chap.343
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on October 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-23 - signed chap.343
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows members of a homeowners association to review books and records and documents related to the expenditure of homeowners association dues.
Title
Allows members of a homeowners association to review books and records and documents related to the expenditure of homeowners association dues.
Sponsors
Sen. James Skoufis [D] | Asm. Earlene Hooper [D] | Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] | Asm. Vivian Cook [D] |
Asm. Sandra Galef [D] | Asm. Clyde Vanel [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-23 | Senate | signed chap.343 |
2017-10-11 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2017-06-20 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-20 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.2080 |
2017-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6648 |
2017-06-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.326 |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | rules report cal.326 |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | reported |
2017-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | print number 3037b |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | print number 3037a |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2017-01-24 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S06648 (Same As) 2017-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3037B