NY A03016 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-26 - print number 3016a
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-26 - print number 3016a
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for radon testing in public and private schools.
Title
Provides for radon testing in public and private schools.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-26 | Assembly | print number 3016a |
2014-03-26 | Assembly | amend and recommit to education |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to education |
2013-01-23 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S02961 (Same As) 2014-01-29 - PRINT NUMBER 2961A