NY A02904 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION
Pending: Senate Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION
Pending: Senate Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
To prevent the imposition of certain fees at the expiration of a term on a motor vehicle lease which constitutes administrative, clerical or handling charges.
Title
An act to amend the personal property law, in relation to prohibiting certain provisions in retail lease agreements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 111 N: 26 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION | |
2010-03-15 | delivered to senate | |
2010-03-15 | passed assembly | |
2010-01-06 | ordered to third reading cal.242 | |
2010-01-06 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-01-06 | DIED IN SENATE | |
2009-03-23 | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION | |
2009-03-23 | delivered to senate | |
2009-03-23 | passed assembly | |
2009-03-12 | advanced to third reading cal.224 | |
2009-03-10 | reported | |
2009-01-21 | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S1396 (Same As) 2010-01-06 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION