NY A02877 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-08 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-08 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to providing innovative infrastructure development.
Title
Relates to providing innovative infrastructure development.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2013-03-04 | Assembly | print number 2877a |
2013-03-04 | Assembly | amend and recommit to transportation |
2013-01-18 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S00740 (Same As) 2013-01-09 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
S06264 (Same As) 2014-01-09 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
S06264 (Same As) 2014-01-09 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION