NY A02700 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-25 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-25 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to requiring maternity patients and the other parent of a newborn child to be educated in safe sleeping practices.
Title
Relates to requiring maternity patients and the other parent of a newborn child to be educated in safe sleeping practices.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2016-02-25 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-02-25 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.124 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-01-06 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2015-04-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2015-04-28 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-04-28 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-04-23 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.185 |
2015-04-22 | Assembly | reported |
2015-01-20 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S05048 (Same As) 2016-06-17 - COMMITTED TO RULES