NY A02575 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 13 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - delivered to governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to commercial fishing licenses; extends the time period such licenses may be issued and sets limits on the number of licenses to be issued.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to commercial fishing licenses; extends the time period such licenses may be issued and sets limits on the number of licenses to be issued.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-13Assemblydelivered to governor
2019-03-04SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-03-04SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-03-04Senate3RD READING CAL.79
2019-03-04SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S2410
2019-02-11SenateREFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
2019-02-11Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-02-11Assemblypassed assembly
2019-01-31Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.31
2019-01-29Assemblyreported
2019-01-23Assemblyreferred to environmental conservation

Same As/Similar To

S02410 (Same As) 2019-03-04 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2575

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback