NY A02574 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-24 - signed chap.72
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-24 - signed chap.72
Summary
To prevent a party in a matrimonial action commenced in Supreme Court from dissipating assets in order to deprive his or her spouse of the property to which that spouse may be entitled.
Title
Establishes automatic orders in matrimonial actions which remain in full force and effect during the pendency of the action, unless terminated, modified or amended by further order of the court upon motion of either of the parties or upon written agreement between the parties duly executed and acknowledged.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-24 | signed chap.72 | |
2009-06-12 | delivered to governor | |
2009-05-04 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2009-05-04 | PASSED SENATE | |
2009-04-28 | 3RD READING CAL.184 | |
2009-04-28 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S2970 | |
2009-03-19 | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY | |
2009-03-19 | delivered to senate | |
2009-03-19 | passed assembly | |
2009-03-12 | advanced to third reading cal.220 | |
2009-03-10 | reported | |
2009-01-20 | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S02970 (Same As) 2009-06-24 - signed chap.72
New York State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02574&term=2009&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y |