NY A02534 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-19 - substituted by s3498
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-19 - substituted by s3498
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that rehabilitation programs for female inmates in state correctional facilities be equivalent to those provided to male inmates of correctional facilities elsewhere in the state; provides that such rehabilitation programs shall include, but not be limited to, vocational, academic and industrial programs.
Title
Requires that rehabilitation programs for female inmates in state correctional facilities be equivalent to those provided to male inmates of correctional facilities elsewhere in the state; provides that such rehabilitation programs shall include, but not be limited to, vocational, academic and industrial programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-19 | Assembly | substituted by s3498 |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.75 |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | rules report cal.75 |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | reported |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-03-22 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-01-20 | Assembly | referred to correction |
Same As/Similar To
S03498 (Same As) 2017-10-23 - APPROVAL MEMO.8