NY A02487 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-25 - signed chap.205
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-25 - signed chap.205
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows severely disabled individuals to apply for renewal of a parking permit for a handicapped person without providing an updated certification or additional medical documents.
Title
Allows severely disabled individuals to apply for renewal of a parking permit for a handicapped person without providing an updated certification or additional medical documents.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-25 | Assembly | signed chap.205 |
2024-07-25 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2024-05-30 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-05-30 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-05-30 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.774 |
2024-05-30 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S1900A |
2024-05-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2024-05-23 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2024-05-23 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2024-05-22 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.94 |
2024-05-22 | Assembly | rules report cal.94 |
2024-05-22 | Assembly | reported |
2024-05-21 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | print number 2487a |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to transportation |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2023-01-26 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S01900 (Same As) 2024-05-30 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2487A