NY A02320 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-06 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires sugar-sweetened beverages to be labeled with a safety warning.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires sugar-sweetened beverages to be labeled with a safety warning.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-06-06Assemblyreported referred to rules
2016-02-02Assemblyreported referred to codes
2016-01-06Assemblyreferred to consumer affairs and protection
2015-04-28Assemblyreported referred to codes
2015-04-23Assemblyprint number 2320b
2015-04-23Assemblyamend and recommit to consumer affairs and protection
2015-03-16Assemblyprint number 2320a
2015-03-16Assemblyamend and recommit to consumer affairs and protection
2015-01-15Assemblyreferred to consumer affairs and protection

Same As/Similar To

S06435 (Same As) 2016-05-10 - DEFEATED IN AGRICULTURE

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback