NY S06435 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-10 - DEFEATED IN AGRICULTURE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires sugar-sweetened beverages to be labeled with a safety warning.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires sugar-sweetened beverages to be labeled with a safety warning.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-10SenateDEFEATED IN AGRICULTURE
2016-03-14SenateNOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED
2016-01-13SenateREFERRED TO AGRICULTURE

Same As/Similar To

A02320 (Same As) 2016-06-06 - reported referred to rules

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback