NY A02301 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-06 - substituted by s1676a
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-06 - substituted by s1676a
Summary
Makes provisions on planning and development of urban and regional farmers market facilities.
Title
Establishes the urban and regional farmers' markets facilities construction program; defines related terms and regulates grants and financing; establishes revolving loan and loan guarantee fund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-06 | substituted by s1676a | |
2009-04-20 | amended on third reading (t) 2301a | |
2009-04-20 | vote reconsidered - restored to third reading | |
2009-04-20 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2009-04-20 | recalled from senate | |
2009-04-07 | RECOMMITTED TO AGRICULTURE | |
2009-04-07 | SUBSTITUTION RECONSIDERED | |
2009-02-24 | 3RD READING CAL.14 | |
2009-02-24 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S1676 | |
2009-02-23 | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE | |
2009-02-23 | delivered to senate | |
2009-02-23 | passed assembly | |
2009-02-19 | advanced to third reading cal.92 | |
2009-02-11 | reported | |
2009-01-27 | reported referred to ways and means | |
2009-01-15 | referred to agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S1676-A (Same As) 2009-02-24 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2301
New York State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02301&term=2009&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y |