NY A02258 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on November 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-11-17 - approval memo.23
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on November 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-11-17 - approval memo.23
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the installation of certain security devices used to control access to common areas of a residential building without the written permission of the owners, board of managers, board of directors, or authorized party of such property.
Title
Prohibits the installation of certain security devices used to control access to common areas of a residential building without the written permission of the owners, board of managers, board of directors, or authorized party of such property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-11-17 | Assembly | approval memo.23 |
2023-11-17 | Assembly | signed chap.637 |
2023-11-13 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2023-06-05 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-06-05 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-06-05 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.325 |
2023-06-05 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S358B |
2023-05-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2023-05-22 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2023-05-22 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-05-22 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.191 |
2023-05-22 | Assembly | rules report cal.191 |
2023-05-22 | Assembly | reported |
2023-05-16 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-05-02 | Assembly | print number 2258b |
2023-05-02 | Assembly | amend and recommit to housing |
2023-04-05 | Assembly | print number 2258a |
2023-04-05 | Assembly | amend and recommit to housing |
2023-01-25 | Assembly | referred to housing |
Same As/Similar To
S00358 (Same As) 2023-06-05 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2258B