NY S00358 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-05 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2258B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits the installation of certain security devices used to control access to common areas of a residential building without the written permission of the owners, board of managers, board of directors, or authorized party of such property.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits the installation of certain security devices used to control access to common areas of a residential building without the written permission of the owners, board of managers, board of directors, or authorized party of such property.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-05SenateSUBSTITUTED BY A2258B
2023-05-08SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 358B
2023-03-21SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 358A
2023-02-14SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2023-02-13Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2023-02-08Senate1ST REPORT CAL.325
2023-01-04SenateREFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION

Same As/Similar To

A02258 (Same As) 2023-11-17 - approval memo.23

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback