NY A02201 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-03 - signed chap.64
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-03 - signed chap.64
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the commissioner of health to promulgate a list of prescription drugs for which an emergency thirty-day supply cannot be obtained during a state emergency.
Title
Directs the commissioner of health to promulgate a list of prescription drugs for which an emergency thirty-day supply cannot be obtained during a state emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-03 | Assembly | signed chap.64 |
2023-03-03 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2023-02-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-02-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-02-06 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.165 |
2023-02-06 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S2228 |
2023-02-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2023-02-01 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2023-02-01 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-01-31 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.71 |
2023-01-31 | Assembly | rules report cal.71 |
2023-01-31 | Assembly | reported |
2023-01-31 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-01-23 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S02228 (Same As) 2023-02-06 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2201