NY A02183 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-02 - substituted by s3887
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-02 - substituted by s3887
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates a portion of the state highway system otherwise known as the "3rd Street Bridge" as the "Dr. Martin Luther King Jr. - Michael Henry Schwerner Memorial Bridge" connecting Mount Vernon, county of Westchester with the town of Pelham, county of Westchester.
Title
Designates a portion of the state highway system otherwise known as the "3rd Street Bridge" as the "Dr. Martin Luther King Jr. - Michael Henry Schwerner Memorial Bridge" connecting Mount Vernon, county of Westchester with the town of Pelham, county of Westchester.
Sponsors
Asm. Gary Pretlow [D] | Asm. Amy Paulin [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-02 | Assembly | substituted by s3887 |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | rules report cal.297 |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | reported |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-01-14 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S03887 (Same As) 2021-07-28 - SIGNED CHAP.312