NY S03887 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-28 - SIGNED CHAP.312
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-28 - SIGNED CHAP.312
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates a portion of the state highway system otherwise known as the "3rd Street Bridge" as the "Dr. Martin Luther King Jr. - Michael Henry Schwerner Memorial Bridge" connecting Mount Vernon, county of Westchester with the town of Pelham, county of Westchester.
Title
Designates a portion of the state highway system otherwise known as the "3rd Street Bridge" as the "Dr. Martin Luther King Jr. - Michael Henry Schwerner Memorial Bridge" connecting Mount Vernon, county of Westchester with the town of Pelham, county of Westchester.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-28 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.312 |
2021-07-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.297 |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | substituted for a2183 |
2021-03-03 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2021-03-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-03-03 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-03-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-02-24 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.426 |
2021-02-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A02183 (Same As) 2021-06-02 - substituted by s3887