NY A02170 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - print number 2170a
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - print number 2170a
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to enacting the "save New York call center jobs act"; requires prior notice of relocation of call center jobs from New York to a foreign country; directs the commissioner of labor to maintain a list of employers who move call center jobs; prohibits loans or grants.
Title
Relates to enacting the "save New York call center jobs act"; requires prior notice of relocation of call center jobs from New York to a foreign country; directs the commissioner of labor to maintain a list of employers who move call center jobs; prohibits loans or grants.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | Assembly | print number 2170a |
2018-02-15 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to labor |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to labor |
2017-01-17 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S01804 (Same As) 2018-01-22 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE