NY A02002 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-06 - referred to environmental conservation
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-06 - referred to environmental conservation
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes requirements for notice, access to information and public comment period with respect to uniform procedures for pending environmental protection agency projects and regulation.
Title
Establishes requirements for notice, access to information and public comment period with respect to uniform procedures for pending environmental protection agency projects and regulation.
Sponsors
Asm. Jeffrey Dinowitz [D] | Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D] | Asm. William Colton [D] | Asm. Steven Otis [D] |
Asm. Donna Lupardo [D] | Asm. Nick Perry [D] | Asm. Philip Ramos [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | print number 2002a |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | amend and recommit to environmental conservation |
2015-01-13 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |