NY A01892 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-7)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-10 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-10 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Adds the act of pretending to be an employee of a public utility company or corporation for the purpose of knowingly entering or remaining unlawfully in or upon a premises to the crime of criminal impersonation in the first degree, a class E felony.
Title
Adds the act of pretending to be an employee of a public utility company or corporation for the purpose of knowingly entering or remaining unlawfully in or upon a premises to the crime of criminal impersonation in the first degree, a class E felony.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-10 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2017-01-13 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S03882 (Same As) 2018-06-11 - referred to codes