NY S03882 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-11 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-11 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Adds the act of pretending to be an employee of a public utility company or corporation for the purpose of knowingly entering or remaining unlawfully in or upon a premises to the crime of criminal impersonation in the first degree, a class E felony.
Title
Adds the act of pretending to be an employee of a public utility company or corporation for the purpose of knowingly entering or remaining unlawfully in or upon a premises to the crime of criminal impersonation in the first degree, a class E felony.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-11 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2018-06-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-04-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-04-18 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.827 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-02-14 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2017-02-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-02-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-02-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-02-07 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.169 |
2017-01-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A01892 (Same As) 2018-04-10 - enacting clause stricken
A10564 (Same As) 2018-05-07 - referred to codes
A10564 (Same As) 2018-05-07 - referred to codes