NY A01849 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to including the illegal conversions of dwelling units in the definition of harassment.
Title
Relates to including the illegal conversions of dwelling units in the definition of harassment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 18 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-05-31 | Assembly | print number 1849a |
2019-05-31 | Assembly | amend and recommit to housing |
2019-01-17 | Assembly | referred to housing |
Same As/Similar To
S03436 (Same As) 2020-03-11 - PRINT NUMBER 3436C