NY A01819 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-25 - substituted by s1851a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-25 - substituted by s1851a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits a state party from using the word "Independent" or "Independence" in its name.
Title
Prohibits a state party from using the word "Independent" or "Independence" in its name.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-25 | Assembly | substituted by s1851a |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | amended on third reading 1819a |
2022-02-17 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.423 |
2022-02-14 | Assembly | reported |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to election law |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-01-11 | Assembly | referred to election law |
Same As/Similar To
S01851 (Same As) 2022-12-09 - SIGNED CHAP.671