NY A01819 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-16)
Status: Vetoed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the residence of sex offender registrants.
Title
Relates to the residence of sex offender registrants.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-28 | Senate | tabled |
2016-11-28 | Senate | vetoed memo.229 |
2016-11-16 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2016-06-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-08 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-08 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1382 |
2016-06-08 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S1608A |
2016-01-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2016-01-26 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-01-26 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.82 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-01-06 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2015-06-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.328 |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | rules report cal.328 |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | print number 1819a |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | amend and recommit to correction |
2015-01-13 | Assembly | referred to correction |
Same As/Similar To
S01608 (Same As) 2016-06-08 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1819A