NY A01644 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-10 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-10 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that all human services contracts between any public entity and a human services provider stipulate that the public entity will pay no less than 150% of the higher of: the otherwise applicable minimum wage in the state or any otherwise applicable wage rule or order and that the necessary amounts have been appropriated to ensure payment of such minimum wage.
Title
Requires that all human services contracts between any public entity and a human services provider stipulate that the public entity will pay no less than 150% of the higher of: the otherwise applicable minimum wage in the state or any otherwise applicable wage rule or order and that the necessary amounts have been appropriated to ensure payment of such minimum wage.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-10 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to labor |
2023-02-16 | Assembly | print number 1644a |
2023-02-16 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to labor |
2023-01-17 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S04930 (Same As) 2024-03-05 - PRINT NUMBER 4930A