NY A01635 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-13 - signed chap.12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-13 - signed chap.12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes any person licensed as a physician, physician's assistant, massage therapist, physical therapist, chiropractor, dentist, optometrist, nurse, nurse practitioner or podiatrist in another state or territory and appointed by the World Triathlon Corporation to practice his or her profession in this state in connection with an athletic event sanctioned by such corporation.
Title
Authorizes any person licensed as a physician, physician's assistant, massage therapist, physical therapist, chiropractor, dentist, optometrist, nurse, nurse practitioner or podiatrist in another state or territory and appointed by the World Triathlon Corporation to practice his or her profession in this state in connection with an athletic event sanctioned by such corporation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-13 | Senate | signed chap.12 |
2011-04-01 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2011-03-21 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-03-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-03-16 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.191 |
2011-03-16 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S1689 |
2011-03-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2011-03-14 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2011-03-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2011-03-10 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.101 |
2011-03-08 | Assembly | reported |
2011-01-11 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S01689 (Same As) 2011-03-16 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1635