NY A01366 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-23 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
Pending: Senate Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-23 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
Pending: Senate Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to requiring notice to neighboring landowners within one thousand feet of intention to develop in wetland areas; requires a public hearing on a wetland application.
Title
Relates to requiring notice to neighboring landowners within one thousand feet of intention to develop in wetland areas; requires a public hearing on a wetland application.
Sponsors
Asm. Michael Cusick [D] | Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D] | Asm. Matthew Titone [D] | Asm. Steven Englebright [D] |
Asm. Thomas Abinanti [D] | Asm. Donna Lupardo [D] | Asm. Steven Otis [D] | Asm. Michele Titus [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2018-01-23 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-01-23 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.94 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-05-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.377 |
2017-05-16 | Assembly | reported |
2017-05-09 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-01-11 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S01866 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION