NY A01358 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-13 - print number 1358c
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-13 - print number 1358c
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to requiring certain town and village justices be admitted to practice law in the state; requires town and village justices in a town or village with a high arraignment volume be admitted to practice law in New York state for at least five years as of the date they commence the duties of office; provides the determination of a town or village with a high arraignment volume shall be made by the office of court administration in consultation with the division of criminal justice services.
Title
Relates to requiring certain town and village justices be admitted to practice law in the state; requires town and village justices in a town or village with a high arraignment volume be admitted to practice law in New York state for at least five years as of the date they commence the duties of office; provides the determination of a town or village with a high arraignment volume shall be made by the office of court administration in consultation with the division of criminal justice services.
Sponsors
Asm. Fred Thiele [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-13 | Assembly | print number 1358c |
2024-05-13 | Assembly | amend and recommit to judiciary |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | print number 1358b |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | amend and recommit to judiciary |
2023-05-02 | Assembly | print number 1358a |
2023-05-02 | Assembly | amend and recommit to judiciary |
2023-01-17 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S00139 (Same As) 2024-05-16 - referred to judiciary