NY S00139 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to requiring certain town and village justices be admitted to practice law in the state; requires town and village justices in a town or village with a high volume caseload be admitted to practice law in New York state for at least five years as of the date they commence the duties of office; provides the determination of a town or village with a high volume caseload shall be made by the office of court administration in consultation with the division of criminal justice services.
Title
Relates to requiring certain town and village justices be admitted to practice law in the state; requires town and village justices in a town or village with a high volume caseload be admitted to practice law in New York state for at least five years as of the date they commence the duties of office; provides the determination of a town or village with a high volume caseload shall be made by the office of court administration in consultation with the division of criminal justice services.
Sponsors
Sen. Sean Ryan [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-03-27 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-03-26 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.713 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2023-06-06 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2023-06-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-06-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-06-06 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1583 |
2023-06-06 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2023-05-30 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 139B |
2023-05-30 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY |
2023-04-25 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 139A |
2023-04-25 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY |
2023-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A01358 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to judiciary