NY A01326 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-22 - amended on third reading 1326a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-22 - amended on third reading 1326a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
This bill would prohibit the sale of pistols or revolvers by any person, firm or corporation in the retail business of selling guns which does not contain child proofing features built into the design of the gun.
Title
Proscribes persons, firms or corporations engaged in the retail business of selling firearms from selling, delivering or transferring child operated firearms; defines "child operated firearm" to mean a pistol or revolver manufactured 1 year after the effective date of these provisions which does not contain a childproofing device or mechanism incorporated into the design of such pistol or revolver to effectively preclude an average 5 year old from firing same; makes violations a class A misdemeanor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-04-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 94 N: 49 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-22 | amended on third reading 1326a | |
2010-01-06 | ordered to third reading cal.118 | |
2010-01-06 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-01-06 | DIED IN SENATE | |
2009-04-28 | REFERRED TO CODES | |
2009-04-28 | delivered to senate | |
2009-04-28 | passed assembly | |
2009-04-09 | advanced to third reading cal.306 | |
2009-04-06 | reported | |
2009-01-07 | referred to codes |