NY A01273 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on August 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-14 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on August 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-14 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Starr public library district and provides for the means for construction and financing of facilities for the district.
Title
Creates the Starr public library district and provides for the means for construction and financing of facilities for the district.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-14 | Senate | tabled |
2015-08-13 | Senate | vetoed memo.189 |
2015-08-03 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2015-06-15 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-15 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5500 |
2015-06-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2015-06-11 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-06-11 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.207 |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | rules report cal.207 |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-08 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2015-01-09 | Assembly | referred to libraries and education technology |
Same As/Similar To
S05500 (Same As) 2015-06-15 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1273