NY A01194 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-06-03 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-06-03 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the retention of any amount of payment due and owing for materials delivered and accepted for a public or private construction project.
Title
Prohibits the retention of any amount of payment due and owing for materials delivered and accepted for a public or private construction project.
Sponsors
Asm. Edward Braunstein [D] | Asm. Carrie Woerner [D] | Asm. Phillip Steck [D] | Asm. Amy Paulin [D] |
Asm. Karl Brabenec [R] | Asm. Albert Stirpe [D] | Asm. Christopher Tague [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 126 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 26 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-29 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 26 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-29 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.300 |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | rules report cal.300 |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | reported |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2024-05-29 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2024-05-24 | Assembly | print number 1194a |
2024-05-24 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental operations |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2023-01-13 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S06855 (Same As) 2024-05-30 - PRINT NUMBER 6855A