NY A01084 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-17 - substituted by s2372
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-17 - substituted by s2372
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the publication of the number of veterans or surviving spouses of veterans on certain housing waiting lists.
Title
Requires the publication of the number of veterans or surviving spouses of veterans on certain housing waiting lists.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-17 | Assembly | substituted by s2372 |
2023-05-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.136 |
2023-05-17 | Assembly | reported |
2023-05-16 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-03-28 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2023-01-13 | Assembly | referred to housing |
Same As/Similar To
S02372 (Same As) 2023-11-10 - SIGNED CHAP.621