NY S02372 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on November 10 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-11-10 - SIGNED CHAP.621
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the publication of the number of veterans or surviving spouses of veterans on certain housing waiting lists.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires the publication of the number of veterans or surviving spouses of veterans on certain housing waiting lists.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction and Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-11-10SenateSIGNED CHAP.621
2023-11-09SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2023-05-17Assemblyreturned to senate
2023-05-17Assemblypassed assembly
2023-05-17Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.136
2023-05-17Assemblysubstituted for a1084
2023-02-28Assemblyreferred to housing
2023-02-28SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2023-02-28SenatePASSED SENATE
2023-02-27SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2023-02-15Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2023-02-14Senate1ST REPORT CAL.368
2023-01-20SenateREFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT

Same As/Similar To

A01084 (Same As) 2023-05-17 - substituted by s2372

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback