NY A00973 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-16 - signed chap.28
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-16 - signed chap.28
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the office of temporary and disability assistance to produce a report regarding the summer youth employment program.
Title
Requires the office of temporary and disability assistance to produce a report regarding the summer youth employment program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 150 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-12 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 150 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-12 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-16 | Assembly | signed chap.28 |
2021-02-12 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2021-02-02 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-02-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-02-02 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.71 |
2021-02-02 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S1300 |
2021-01-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2021-01-25 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-01-25 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-01-14 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.9 |
2021-01-12 | Assembly | reported |
2021-01-06 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S01300 (Same As) 2021-02-02 - SUBSTITUTED BY A973