NY S01300 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-02 - SUBSTITUTED BY A973
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-02 - SUBSTITUTED BY A973
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the office of temporary and disability assistance to produce a report regarding the summer youth employment program.
Title
Requires the office of temporary and disability assistance to produce a report regarding the summer youth employment program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-02 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A973 |
2021-01-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.71 |
2021-01-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A00973 (Same As) 2021-02-16 - signed chap.28