NY A00892 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-26 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-26 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the definition of "population" for purposes of providing substantially equal weight for the population of that local government in the allocation of representation in the local legislative body.
Title
Relates to the definition of "population" for purposes of providing substantially equal weight for the population of that local government in the allocation of representation in the local legislative body.
Sponsors
Asm. Jonathan Jacobson [D] | Asm. Steven Otis [D] | Asm. Nader Sayegh [D] | Asm. Aileen Gunther [D] |
Asm. Eddie Gibbs [D] | Asm. Dana Levenberg [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 89 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2024-03-26 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2024-03-26 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.31 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2023-05-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-05-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.135 |
2023-05-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.135 |
2023-05-17 | Assembly | reported |
2023-05-16 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-01-11 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S00444 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT