NY A00793 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on December 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-12-22 - approval memo.62
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on December 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-12-22 - approval memo.62
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the office of mental health to establish a training program for the diagnosis and treatment of post-traumatic stress disorder for military veterans; the program shall include a component on military culture competency and shall be intended for the training of mental health providers and mental health clinicians; certification of the completion of the program may be provided to participants through the office.
Title
Requires the office of mental health to establish a training program for the diagnosis and treatment of post-traumatic stress disorder for military veterans; the program shall include a component on military culture competency and shall be intended for the training of mental health providers and mental health clinicians; certification of the completion of the program may be provided to participants through the office.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - Assembly - Assembly Mental Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - Assembly - Assembly Mental Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-22 | Assembly | approval memo.62 |
2023-12-22 | Assembly | signed chap.736 |
2023-12-12 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2023-06-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-06-08 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-06-08 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1779 |
2023-06-08 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7274 |
2023-05-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH |
2023-05-30 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2023-05-30 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-05-30 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.318 |
2023-05-30 | Assembly | rules report cal.318 |
2023-05-30 | Assembly | reported |
2023-05-24 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-03-09 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2023-01-11 | Assembly | referred to mental health |
Same As/Similar To
S07274 (Same As) 2023-06-08 - SUBSTITUTED BY A793