NY A00726 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-09 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-09 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits agencies from charging for the process of a FOIL request made by state and local agencies or the state legislature.
Title
Prohibits agencies from charging for the process of a FOIL request made by state and local agencies or the state legislature.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-09 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2014-06-03 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.292 |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.292 |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2013-06-11 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2013-06-04 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2013-01-09 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |